Financial history OAKS ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1107998
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.32k £3.23k £5.25k £3.72k £0
Total expenditure £1.77k £3.96k £2.65k £2.02k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A