BRAMHOPE VILLAGE PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1112045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 23 June 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required