BRAMHOPE VILLAGE PROPERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1112045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Robinson Trustee 20 February 2019 None on record
Alan Anslow Trustee 24 October 2018 None on record
Maria Gill Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record
MARION RIDER Trustee 02 April 2013
THE ROBERT CRAVEN MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time
DIANE FOX Trustee 24 September 2014 None on record
Dr Campbell Cowan Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record
BILLY FLYNN Trustee 24 September 2014 None on record
Anne-Marie Pickstock Trustee 24 February 2021 None on record
David Bryant Trustee 26 November 2015 None on record
Amanda Lawrence Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
HILARY HARRIS Trustee None on record
JOHN HOWARD Trustee 15 August 2011 None on record
Martin Fogel Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record