SHREE RAM KRISHNA CENTRE

Charity number: 1108689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download