THAMES HOSPICE

Charity number: 1108298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN TOOHEY Trustee 21 December 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, SANDHURST Received: On time
Nilesh Shah Trustee 21 December 2020 None on record
BRUCE MONTGOMERY Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Jacinta Ashworth Trustee 14 January 2014 None on record
Catherine McLaughlin Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Dr Judith Kinder Trustee 04 December 2017 None on record
Janet King Trustee 11 June 2020 None on record
JONATHAN JONES Chair 24 August 2012
PAUL BEVAN CANCER FOUNDATION Received: On time
KENNETH COPPOCK Trustee 31 July 2013
CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION Received: 17 days late
CHRISTOPHER GRANT AITKEN Trustee 31 July 2013
ST. GEORGE'S HOUSE TRUST (WINDSOR CASTLE) Received: On time
THE WINDSOR AND ETON SOCIETY INCORPORATING WINDSOR HERITAGE Received: On time
WINDSOR AND ETON CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE WINDSOR BENEFIT TRUST Received: On time
THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND Received: On time
THE FOUNDATION OF THE COLLEGE OF ST GEORGE WINDSOR CASTLE Received: On time
Craig Linton Trustee 27 November 2014
SOFII FOUNDATION Received: On time
Andy Ka Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Margaret Neal Trustee 14 January 2014 None on record