THE GUILDFORD MUKONO LINK

Charity number: 1111069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.33k £9.06k £10.43k £19.47k £14.53k
Total expenditure £6.19k £12.84k £8.82k £16.38k £16.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £420 £420 N/A