RUTLAND CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rutland Citizens Advice Bureau helps people resolve their legal, money and other problems by providing information and advice, and by influencing policymakers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £75,499 from 3 government contract(s) and £241,581 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rutland
Governance
- 02 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Cooper | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Coulson | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Susan Jarron | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Mortlock | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Hannah Adele Williams | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Michael Cropper | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £659.65k | £590.92k | £724.05k | £464.26k | £484.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £713.12k | £622.68k | £690.15k | £399.51k | £443.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £504.70k | £504.70k | £504.70k | £65.00k | £75.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £170.00k | £241.58k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £37.11k | £43.15k | £56.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £525 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £619.74k | £546.45k | £666.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.28k | £1.32k | £952 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £677.37k | £611.65k | £649.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £35.74k | £11.03k | £40.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £38.53k | £29.03k | £53.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £69.06k | £12.85k | £11.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/2015 as amended on 25 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN RUTLAND AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
RUTLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 HIGH STREET
OAKHAM
RUTLAND
LE15 6AL
- Phone:
- 01572723494
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window