BOURNE VALLEY GOOD NEIGHBOUR LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1108029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

This charity consists of a team of local volunteers who offer help with transport and care for people in need. This may be transport for an appointment or shopping, help at home or just a friendly chat. The charity is managed by a team of local volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £9,552
Total expenditure: £10,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BVGNLS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON Chair
BOURNE VALLEY DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
WINTERBOURNE GLEBE HALL
Received: On time
Christopher Dennis Andrews Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Leonie Elizabeth Louise Winborn Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
MRS R MILES Trustee 10 January 2012
None on record
MRS D HENDRY Trustee 08 January 2012
None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee 08 January 2012
None on record
LINDA BUCKLE Trustee 08 January 2012
None on record
MRS J BOUCHER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.92k £14.19k £10.91k £5.48k £9.55k
Total expenditure £12.67k £12.63k £11.92k £7.58k £10.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Twingley
The Portway
Winterbourne Gunner
Salisbury
Wiltshire
SP4 6JL
Phone:
01980611311