Accounts and annual returns AMAZING PLAY

Charity number: 1109383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 23 March 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 March 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 22 March 2021 387 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 June 2019 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 25 July 2018 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required