BLOOD BUDDIES

Charity number: 1108692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.07k £5.05k £25.10k £1.70k £20.06k
Total expenditure £300 £5.62k £1.52k £38.38k £39.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A