CRAGHEAD DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1107991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £257.00k £242.00k £275.00k £274.00k £235.60k
Total expenditure £196.00k £236.00k £268.00k £274.00k £263.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £3.00k £6.00k N/A