THE TENDRING FURNITURE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The collection and redistribution of furniture to low income families and individuals in need. The provision of training and work experience to individuals disadvantaged in the employment market.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 06 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Allison | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Ridgeon | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Allison | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hearne | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Hearne | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.45k | £166.91k | £186.22k | £175.71k | £189.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.43k | £147.15k | £169.88k | £165.73k | £193.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £103.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN TENDRING, ESSEX, AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OF OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NO OTHER MEANS OF OBTAINING HELP. (B) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF TENDRING, ESSEX, AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING TRAINING OF VOLUNTEERS TO ENHANCE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
TENDRING, ESSEX, AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rocket House
43
Stephenson Road
Clacton on Sea
Essex
- Phone:
- 01255476068
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window