THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1108381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 28 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 June 2018 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 June 2018 131 days late Download