Financial history THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1108381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/03/2018 28/03/2019 28/03/2020 28/03/2021 28/03/2022
Total gross income £17.36m £17.64m £16.96m £19.35m £19.01m
Total expenditure £17.42m £17.70m £17.01m £19.32m £19.07m
Income from government contracts £17.36m £16.95m £16.95m £17.86m £19.01m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.49m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.74m £16.95m £15.33m £17.86m £19.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £518 £1.38k £2.11k £40 £65
Income - Other £0 £688.41k £1.62m £1.49m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.42m £17.70m £17.01m £19.32m £19.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £21.37k £25.48k £18.06k £17.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0