Trustees THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1108381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Anthony Stredder Trustee 03 March 2023
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Julian Alexander Pearce Trustee 02 October 2020
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Tracey Wardle Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Anna Humphries Trustee 24 April 2019
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Philippa Spratley Trustee 20 February 2018
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Kerry Margaret Dearden Trustee 01 February 2017
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Daniel Hayes Trustee 01 September 2015
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
KEVIN BOLT Trustee 28 August 2014
THE OXFORDSHIRE CARE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time