SATELLITE

Charity number: 1109171
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1924 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1924 days