SATELLITE

Charity number: 1109171
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £36.44k £23.17k £53.84k £32.07k £22.63k
Total expenditure £18.66k £40.71k £40.82k £41.41k £18.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A