Accounts and annual returns NUNEATON & BEDWORTH LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1109970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window