Accounts and annual returns ST CHARLES HADFIELD PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1109416
Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 380 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 380 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 745 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 745 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 March 2022 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required