LAINDON ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1110470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 25 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 22 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required