LAINDON ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1110470
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £14.14k £18.49k £17.16k £14.92k £19.98k
Total expenditure £11.51k £20.43k £15.16k £13.96k £16.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A