Accounts and annual returns STAGE 2 YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1108213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window