Financial history Notting Hill Genesis Community Foundation

Charity number: 1109918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.00k £42.13k £34.00k £29.00k £757
Total expenditure £129.64k £109.27k £275.00k £736.00k £441.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A