Accounts and annual returns ACTION FOR HEALTH, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT (AHEAD)

Charity number: 1109270
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 20 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 15 May 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required