Accounts and annual returns UNITED UTILITIES TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1108296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window