AFRICA VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1109024
Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 669 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 669 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1034 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1034 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1399 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1399 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1764 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1764 days