Accounts and annual returns SAINT JOHN OF GOD HOSPITALLER SERVICES

Charity number: 1108428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window