ALPINE GARDEN SOCIETY WEST YORKSHIRE GROUP

Charity number: 1108476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 02/04/2016 02/04/2017 02/04/2018 02/04/2019 02/04/2020
Total gross income £4.96k £6.37k £2.29k £2.21k £1.76k
Total expenditure £4.05k £1.50k £1.60k £1.84k £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A