BRISTOL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1109141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 December 2016 On time Download