BRISTOL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1109141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.67m £3.82m £5.80m £2.83m £2.27m
Total expenditure £1.74m £1.47m £1.24m £1.59m £2.18m
Income from government contracts £221.67k £166.24k £18.57k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £1.34m £325.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £352 £1.86m £8.86k £492 £2.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.03m £1.11m £828.71k £1.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £516.04k £534.40k £592.59k £638.48k £662.28k
Income - Other £7.58k £402.77k £4.09m £1.36m £218.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.47m £1.24m £1.59m £2.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.28k £29.02k £30.26k £29.29k £30.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £90.19k £75.10k £93.39k £95.06k £118.57k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £34.25k £0 £0 £0 £1.91k