BRISTOL CHARITIES

Charity number: 1109141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Carrington-Porter Cert Mgmt. Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Richard Arthur Gore BA Chair 06 December 2012
BAYNARDS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
Ian Dunn BA Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Keith Graham Low BSc MRICS Trustee 25 September 2019 None on record
Andrew Guise Mennell MSc MCIH Trustee 26 September 2018 None on record
Rachel Mary Howell Trustee 26 September 2018 None on record
JONATHAN THOMAS O'SHEA Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
Mark Patrick Finch MBA FRICS Trustee 25 September 2019 None on record
PAUL ANDREW STAPLES Trustee 28 October 2014 None on record
Nolan Ellis Webber FCSI Trustee 27 September 2016 None on record
Olivia Lettice Spencer BSc RIBA Trustee 26 September 2018 None on record
Harriet Frances Bosnell Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
Michelle Meredith Trustee 16 January 2014 None on record