Accounts and annual returns THE TLC - TENDER LOVING CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1109511
Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
Annual return 12 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 516 days
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 516 days
Annual return 12 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
Annual return 12 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1246 days
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1246 days
Annual return 12 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days