Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BRISLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required