CRIMESTOPPERS TRUST

Charity number: 1108687
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £405.36k £170.85k £103.76k £423.19k £518.17k
Income from government grants £900.00k £855.00k £864.88k £913.46k £891.18k
Other income £3.64m £3.57m £4.04m £3.82m £3.99m
Total expenditure £4.79m £4.69m £5.14m £5.17m £5.47m