THE CONSORTIUM OF CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION (CCA)

Charity number: 1110264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 July 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 10 May 2020 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 07 March 2018 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required