THE CONSORTIUM OF CONGOLESE ASSOCIATION (CCA)

Charity number: 1110264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £232 £318 £554 £626 £1.23k
Total expenditure £132 £287 £442 £453 £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A