Accounts and annual returns THE SUB-SAHARAN AGENDA (TESSA)

Charity number: 1108901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2021 15 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2019 22 March 2021 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2018 25 April 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 Not Required