Financial history THE SUB-SAHARAN AGENDA (TESSA)

Charity number: 1108901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020 30/05/2021
Total gross income £8.68k £6.35k £6.75k £5.89k £5.98k
Total expenditure £8.80k £6.31k £7.22k £5.69k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A