LIVE AUDACIOUS

Charity number: 1108799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time Download