LIVE AUDACIOUS

Charity number: 1108799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £195.98k £178.00k £3.79k £3.82k £4.69k
Total expenditure £191.85k £189.97k £3.74k £1.74k £4.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A