Accounts and annual returns St Mary's Church of England Primary School Parent Teacher and Friends Association Mucklestone
Charity number: 1109596

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 July 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 July 2019 | 23 September 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 July 2018 | 23 September 2019 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 July 2017 | 16 July 2018 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window