KINGDOM LOVE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1111394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 06 August 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 06 August 2020 128 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 12 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 02 August 2018 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2018 205 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 03 May 2017 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required