FRIENDS OF HORNS MILL

Charity number: 1108972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required