EUROPEAN CONTACT GROUP - UNITED KINGDOM (ECG - UK)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
During 2008-2009 the Trustees continued to raise funds and support activities which furthered its objects. The decision was made at the end of 2008-2009 year to wind down the Charity in the following year in that the work it was set up to pursue had either been completed or could be supported from elsewhere. The recruiting of Trustees with time to commit was also proving to be hard.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2009
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 24 Tachwedd 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 10 Mai 2010: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- ECG - UK (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.59k | £32.72k | £24.08k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £261 | £24.42k | £39.79k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2009 | 10 Mai 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2009 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2008 | 04 Medi 2009 | 36 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2008 | 20 Awst 2009 | 21 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2007 | 05 Chwefror 2009 | 190 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2007 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, HELP FOR THOSE IN NEED OF TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING IN BUSINESS. B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGH FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. C) TO PROMOTE ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW BY GOVERNMENTAL, INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL, VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND PROFESSIONAL ORGANISATIONS IN THEIR ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT, TREATMENT OF PERSONNEL, HEALTH SAFETY AND COMMERCIAL PRACTICES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window