THE FOUNDATION FOR INTERNATIONAL LAW

Charity number: 1112484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 29 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 29 November 2016 On time Download