THE FOUNDATION FOR INTERNATIONAL LAW

Charity number: 1112484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £82.50k £67.00k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £103.02k £39.72k £22.54k £2.32k £1.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A