Financial history FRIENDS OF EAST CROMPTON ST JAMES' SCHOOL

Charity number: 1108928
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.31k £4.95k £4.34k £4.09k £4.09k
Total expenditure £6.41k £9.91k £2.01k £5.54k £5.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A