ANGELS OF THE NORTH

Charity number: 1109033
Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £45.77k £30.14k £6.90k £8.07k £32.30k
Total expenditure £46.80k £28.51k £9.85k £4.60k £33.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A