Financial history FAIRSHARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £1.22m £1.94m £2.35m £2.64m £3.12m
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.72m £2.16m £2.67m £2.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.64k £364.65k £433.75k £506.70k £313.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £287.11k £322.42k £421.34k £583.76k £710.77k
Income - Other trading activities £138.13k £140.00k £129.42k £115.36k £272.01k
Income - Charitable activities £790.07k £1.48m £1.79m £1.92m £2.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.50k £350 £376 £634 £174
Income - Other £625 £1.40k £5.38k £12.62k £66.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.62m £1.99m £2.59m £2.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £69.33k £105.20k £164.72k £83.72k £88.48k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0