THE KEMPSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1109049
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £120.04k £125.31k £114.46k £109.45k £107.68k
Total expenditure £119.37k £124.19k £110.97k £104.00k £98.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A